Hernandez v. Doordash, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jonathan Hernandez
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02159
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal.(hw)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Jonathan Hernandez (Brown, Charles)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for June 13, 2019 is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Agreed Third Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant DoorDash, Inc. shall have until June 19, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/5/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (McNamara, Rosalee)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Agreed Second Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant DoorDash, Inc. shall have until June 5, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (McNamara, Rosalee)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Attorneys who wish to appear by phone may do so by sending an email to chambers seven calendar days prior to the date of the hearing. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/6/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/29/2019. (ht)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant DoorDash, Inc. shall have until May 15, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (McNamara, Rosalee)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Jonathan Hernandez upon Doordash, Inc. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Brown, Charles)
March 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Doordash, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Jonathan Hernandez. (Watkins, Jayson)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jonathan Hernandez. (Brown, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4756045.), filed by Jonathan Hernandez.(Brown, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Doordash, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hernandez
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Represented By: Rosalee Miller McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?