Owners Insurance Company v. Dartea LLC et al

Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Glenda Conley, David C. Kirk, Dartea LLC and Kirsten Pervin
Case Number: 2:2019cv02161
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (tvn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Owners Insurance Company WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Wolf, Timothy)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Stay of Proceedings #15 , is GRANTED and this action is stayed until July 8, 2019. The parties are further ordered to submit a Status Report once the hearing in the underlying action has occurred. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/24/2019. (ses)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay by David C. Kirk, Kirsten Pervin. (Billam, Ashley)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is stayed pending the Kansas Supreme Court's decision in Kudlacik. The parties are ordered to submit a status report within ten days after the Kansas Supreme Court's decision in the Kudlacik case or no later than September 3, 2019, whichever comes first. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/02/2019. (ses)
May 2, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #13 Joint MOTION to Stay Case. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ks)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Defendants David C. Kirk, Kirsten Pervin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Billam, Ashley)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Defendants Dartea LLC d/b/a Bill's 32 West and Glenda Conley's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Dartea LLC d/b/a Bill's 32 West and Glenda Conley shall have until May 13, 2019 to file their respective answers or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Defendants Kirsten Pervin and David C. Kirk's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Kirsten Pervin and David C. Kirk shall have until May 13, 2019 to file their respective answers or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/22/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants Glenda Conley, Dartea LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Boone, Cline)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants David C. Kirk, Kirsten Pervin (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Billam, Ashley)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David R. Morantz on behalf of Kirsten Pervin (Morantz, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Owners Insurance Company upon Glenda Conley served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Wolf, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Owners Insurance Company upon Kirsten Pervin served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Wolf, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Owners Insurance Company upon David C. Kirk served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 (Wolf, Timothy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Owners Insurance Company upon Dartea LLC served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 (Wolf, Timothy)
March 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Glenda Conley, Dartea LLC, David C. Kirk, Kirsten Pervin. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Owners Insurance Company identifying Auto-Owners Insurance Company as corporate parent . (Wolf, Timothy)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Owners Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wolf, Timothy)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolf, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Dartea LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Conley
Represented By: Cline I. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Kirk
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dartea LLC
Represented By: Cline I. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Pervin
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?