Orwick v. West Corporation

Plaintiff: David Orwick
Defendant: West Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02182
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by West Corporation.(Russell, Kyle)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re 15 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, addressed to David Orwick. (sz)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Upon review of counsel Michael A. William's Motion to Withdraw and Stay Proceedings (ECF No. 13) and his Notice of Withdrawal, the Court finds counsel has fundamentally complied with the purpose of D. Kan. Rule 83.5.5, as Plaintiff acknowledged counsel's pending withdrawal in writing. Therefore, counsel is permitted to withdraw. Additionally, the initial order setting a scheduling conference date shall not issue until 45 days after Defendants' current answer deadline of 7/10/19 to permit Plaintiff time to either secure counsel or determine to proceed in the matter pro se. A copy of this order shall be mailed to plaintiff David Orwick by certified mail. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/1/19. Mailed to pro se party David Orwick, 7146 Aminda Street, Shawnee, KS 66227 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3818. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Withdraw by David Orwick Notice of Withdraw (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw and Stay Proceedings Pending Entry of New Counsel by Plaintiff David Orwick (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Williams, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant West Corporation answer due 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant West Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Russell, Kyle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Camille L. Roe on behalf of West Corporation. (Roe, Camille)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kyle B. Russell on behalf of West Corporation. (Russell, Kyle)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying, without prejudice to re-filing, Plaintiff's counsel's #6 Motion to Withdraw for failure to strictly comply with the provisions set forth in D. Kan. Rule 83.5.5(a)(1)-(4). Counsel should review the Local Rule and re-file the motion in compliance thereof. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/10/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Orwick. West Corporation waiver sent on 4/10/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (hw)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Stay Proceedings Pending Entry of New Counsel by Plaintiff David Orwick (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Williams, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED INCORRECTLY - SEE DE #7)WAIVER of service of summons by Defendant West Corporation. (Roe, Camille) Modified on 5/9/2019 (hw).
April 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to West Corporation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff David Orwick - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Williams, Michael)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of the Complaint has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposed only. #1 Complaint (ca)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff David Orwick. (Williams, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4770396.), filed by David Orwick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #3 Redacted Complaint) (ca). Modified on 4/9/2019 (ca). Complaint was blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orwick v. West Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Orwick
Represented By: Michael A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Corporation
Represented By: Kyle B. Russell
Represented By: Camille L. Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?