Rehbein et al v. Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Katie Rehbein and Douglas Rehbein
Defendant: Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Resorts, Inc, Proslide Technology, Inc., John Does 1-10 and Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02197
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service - Proslide Technology, Inc. by Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein. (Kimak, J'Nan)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen J. Tasch for Proslide Technology, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 05/23/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Stephen J. Tasch to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4815671.) by Defendant Proslide Technology, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Admission, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Registration Form)(Murphy, Patrick)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Resorts, Inc.(Johannsen, Derek)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Proslide Technology, Inc. identifying PS Attractions, Inc. as corporate parent . (Murphy, Patrick)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Proslide Technology, Inc..(Murphy, Patrick)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the Court grants the parties' joint request to move the Scheduling Conference and related deadlines. The Scheduling Conference is re-set for 7/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) conference no later than 6/21/2019. The Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 initial disclosures are due on 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ts)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for extension of time by Defendants Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Resorts, Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Johannsen, Derek)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 236 before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 6/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/9/2019. (ts)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lauren E. McClain for Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein; #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew K. Smith for Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chelsea McClain Pierce for Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 05/02/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Chelsea M Pierce to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4796019.) by Plaintiffs Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support CMP, #2 ECF Registration Form PHV Registration Form)(Kimak, J'Nan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Andrew K Smith to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4796003.) by Plaintiffs Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support AKS, #2 ECF Registration Form PHV Registration Form)(Kimak, J'Nan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Lauren E McClain to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4795939.) by Plaintiffs Douglas Rehbein, Katie Rehbein (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support LEM, #2 ECF Registration Form PHV Registration Form)(Kimak, J'Nan)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Resorts, Inc.(Johannsen, Derek)
April 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Restors, Inc - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Johannsen, Derek)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Restors, Inc. (Johannsen, Derek)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000237 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4785001.), filed by Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC, Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC, Great Wolf Restors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Petition Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Johannsen, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rehbein et al v. Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Wolf Lodge of Kansas City, LLC
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Wolf Resorts, Inc
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proslide Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J. Tasch
Represented By: Patrick D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Wolf Kansas SPE, LLC
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: Derek G. Johannsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Rehbein
Represented By: J'Nan C. Kimak
Represented By: Chelsea McClain Pierce
Represented By: Andrew K. Smith
Represented By: Lauren E. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Rehbein
Represented By: J'Nan C. Kimak
Represented By: Chelsea McClain Pierce
Represented By: Andrew K. Smith
Represented By: Lauren E. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?