Rider et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Rider and Patricia Maxwell
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02206
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Brown v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2110-JAR-TJJ; Niemann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2308-JAR-TJJ; Hess v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2171-JAR-TJJ; and Rider, et al. v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2206-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/20/2019. (ses)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by June 20, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/13/2019. (bw)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. District Judge Carlos Murguia, Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(hw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Sharon Rider, Patricia Maxwell re #3 Order, (Ruane, Sarah)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 05/03/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/02/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Any party that wishes to be heard on the issue of consolidation is directed to file a response to this order on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 05/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex. Motion to Consolidate)(jc)
April 30, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Patricia Maxwell, Sharon Rider. (Ruane, Sarah)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4792009.), filed by Sharon Rider, Patricia Maxwell.(Ruane, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rider et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Rider
Represented By: Sarah S. Ruane
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Maxwell
Represented By: Sarah S. Ruane
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?