Maupin v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Plaintiff: Darlene Maupin
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02215
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/1/19. (alm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Senior Lifestyle Corporation . (Ballew, Gregory)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Senior Lifestyle Corporation.(Ballew, Gregory)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Senior Lifestyle Corporation answer due 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/20/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Senior Lifestyle Corporation (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Ballew, Gregory)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/17/19 for Defendant Senior Lifestyle Corporation to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/30/19. (hw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 d/b/a Sheridan at Overland Park SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Darlene Maupin upon Senior Lifestyle Corporation served on 5/11/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Proof of Service)(Doyle, Daniel)
May 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Senior Lifestyle Corporation. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 3, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Darlene Maupin. (Doyle, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4796590.), filed by Darlene Maupin.(Doyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maupin v. Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Maupin
Represented By: Daniel L. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Lifestyle Corporation
Represented By: Gregory D. Ballew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?