Fowles v. Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc.
Plaintiff: Titan Fowles
Defendant: Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02222
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Titan Fowles re #5 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Answer to Complaint Out of Time (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmitz, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Linden, Patric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patric S. Linden on behalf of Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. (Linden, Patric)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin D. Case on behalf of Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. (Case, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Answer to Complaint Out of Time by Defendant Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc.(Linden, Patric)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Answer to Complaint Out of Time by Defendant Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Mike Hoesch, #2 Exhibit A-1 Faxed Claim Submission, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of Christian Molica, #4 Exhibit B-1 Hoesch Email to Molica, #5 Exhibit B-2 Molica Email to Customer Service, #6 Exhibit C Affidavit of Jennifer Ward, #7 Exhibit C-1 Email Received by Claims Department, #8 Exhibit C-2 June 17 Email to Hoesch, #9 Exhibit C-3 June 21 Email to Hoesch, #10 Exhibit D Answer)(Linden, Patric)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Patric S. Linden on behalf of Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. (Linden, Patric)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Titan Fowles upon Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019 (Bell, Bryce)
May 10, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Titan Fowles. (Bell, Bryce)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4803452.), filed by Titan Fowles.(Bell, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowles v. Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titan Fowles
Represented By: Bryce B. Bell
Represented By: Mark W. Schmitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison Automotive Plaza, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Case
Represented By: Patric S. Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?