Okorie v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Chijioke Joshua Okorie
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02229
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #26 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Barnard, Ozlem)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss (Barnard, Ozlem)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 unopposed motion to set July 1, 2019, as the deadline for defendants to file a motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 5/31/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time request to set a deadline (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Barnard, Ozlem)
May 28, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Oliver Hacking, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hacking, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Allman on behalf of All Defendants. (Allman, Christopher)
May 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Alan T. Simpson, Assistant United States Attorney as to All Defendants (Simpson, Alan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ozlem Barnard on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry (Barnard, Ozlem)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
May 13, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:18-cv-00952. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Respondents' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer, Doc. #8 , is granted in part and denied in part. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, and in the interest of justice, the Court transfers this action to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Signed on 5/6/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #8 MOTION to dismiss case (with Supporting Suggestions Incorporated) filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of Respondents L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Ozlem Barnard on behalf of All Defendants (Barnard, Ozlem) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #8 MOTION to dismiss case (with Supporting Suggestions Incorporated) filed by James O. Hacking, III on behalf of Plaintiff Chijioke Joshua Okorie. Reply suggestions due by 4/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time to respond to Respondents' motion to dismiss, Doc. #11 , is granted. Plaintiff's response to Respondents' motion to dismiss must be filed on or before April 18, 2019. Signed on 3/13/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #8 MOTION to dismiss case (with Supporting Suggestions Incorporated) filed by James O. Hacking, III on behalf of Chijioke Joshua Okorie. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Respondents' unopposed motion to stay non-venue related discovery pending resolution of their motion to dismiss and for an extension of time to file a proposed scheduling order and to conduct a Rule 26(f) conference, Doc. #9 , is granted. All non-venue related discovery is stayed pending resolution of Respondents' motion to dismiss, Doc. #8 . The Parties' proposed scheduling order and Rule 26(f) conference are due thirty days after the Court's ruling on Respondents' motion to dismiss. Signed on 3/11/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to stay discovery and extension of time to file proposed scheduling order and to conduct Rule 26(f) conference filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss case (with Supporting Suggestions Incorporated) filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration Howlett, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration Miller, #3 Exhibit 2A - Decision N400, #4 Exhibit 2B - Decision N336, #5 Exhibit 2C - NTA packet w N400 denial)(Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/15/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/8/2019. Signed on 1/30/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. In light of the partial cessation of the United States Government, the Court grants Respondents' motion for a 30-day enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Petition, Doc. #5 . Respondents' answer is due on or before March 7, 2019. Signed on 1/29/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to the Petition (in light of partial cessation of United States government filed by Alan Thomas Simpson on behalf of L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Simpson, Alan) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
January 20, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Chijioke Joshua Okorie. L. Francis Cissna served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Kirstjen Nielsen served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Nelson Perez served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019; Michelle Perry served on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. On December 4, 2018, the Court ordered Plaintiff to effect service on all defendants within forty days. That deadline has since passed. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause, on or before January 23, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to timely serve the defendants. Signed on 1/16/2019 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 12/4/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
December 3, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry and U.S. Attorney's Office KCMO, Timothy A. Garrison. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]
December 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Nelson Perez, Michelle Perry filed by James O. Hacking, III on behalf of Chijioke Joshua Okorie. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6058303. Service due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hacking, James) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 5/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okorie v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chijioke Joshua Okorie
Represented By: James Oliver Hacking, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Alan Thomas Simpson
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Ozlem Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nelson Perez
Represented By: Alan Thomas Simpson
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Ozlem Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michelle Perry
Represented By: Alan Thomas Simpson
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Ozlem Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Alan Thomas Simpson
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Ozlem Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?