United States of America v. Lamberd et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jerry Lamberd, Kansas Department of Revenue and Wyandotte County
Case Number: 2:2019cv02241
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Jerry Lamberd of notice of service of initial disclosures of defendant jerry lamberd (Laing, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by United States of America. (Wiesner, Jared)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Wyandotte County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Green, Wendy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for leave to file answer out of time. Defendant Wyandotte County shall file its answer forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE to File Answer to Complaint Out of Time by Defendant Wyandotte County (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer)(Green, Wendy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. The planning report and disclosures will remain due on 7/18/19.(ss)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/18/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/28/19. (ss)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Jerry Lamberd.(Laing, Robert)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by United States of America upon Wyandotte County served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019 (Wiesner, Jared)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by United States of America upon Jerry Lamberd served on 6/1/2019, answer due 6/24/2019 (Wiesner, Jared)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Disclaimer of Interest) by Kansas Department of Revenue.(Wharton, Randall)
May 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas Department of Revenue, Jerry Lamberd, Wyandotte County. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Wiesner, Jared)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff United States of America - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wiesner, Jared)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wiesner, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lamberd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Lamberd
Represented By: Robert R. Laing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Revenue
Represented By: Randall J. Wharton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County
Represented By: Wendy M. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jared S. Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?