James v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roger James, Scott Dwyer, Shannon Marie Stanley, Shannon Marie Swigert, Beth Norris, Brian Brewer, Amanda Crawford and Lisa Vallejo Barnes
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation and Kansas Star Casino, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02260
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 8/9/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/18/19. (ss)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Roger James (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Star Casino, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Drake, Denise)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Collective Action Complaint by Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Star Casino, LLC.(Drake, Denise)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/02/2019 for Defendants Kansas Star Casino, LLC, Boyd Gaming Corporation to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/13/2019. (ca)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Roger James (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Roger James upon Kansas Star Casino, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019 (McClelland, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Roger James upon Boyd Gaming Corporation served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (McClelland, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boyd Gaming Corporation, Kansas Star Casino, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Roger James. (McClelland, Ryan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4817328.), filed by Roger James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join - Roger James)(McClelland, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Boyd Gaming Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd Gaming Corporation
Represented By: Travis L. Salmon
Represented By: Kaitlin E. Gallen
Represented By: Denise K. Drake
Represented By: Jason N.W. Plowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Star Casino, LLC
Represented By: Travis L. Salmon
Represented By: Kaitlin E. Gallen
Represented By: Denise K. Drake
Represented By: Jason N.W. Plowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger James
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dwyer
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Marie Stanley
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Marie Swigert
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Norris
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Brewer
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Crawford
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Vallejo Barnes
Represented By: Michael James Rahmberg
Represented By: Alexander T. Ricke
Represented By: Ryan L. McClelland
Represented By: George A. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?