Braucher v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN BRAUCHER
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC and Credit One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02264
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexis I. Lehmann for Susan Braucher pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Alexis Lehmann to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4850498.) by Plaintiff Susan Braucher (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Shell, Mandy)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Madison A. Perry on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Perry, Madison)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Joshua C. Dickinson on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Dickinson, Joshua)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mandy M. Shell on behalf of Susan Braucher (Shell, Mandy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (hw)
May 29, 2019 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-05227. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS IN THIS MATTER AGAINST DEFENDANT CREDIT ONE ONLY ARE HEREBY SEVERED AND TRANSFERRED IN THEIR ENTIRETY TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF KANSAS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 5/28/19. 5/28/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Sever Claims against Credit One Bank, N.A. and Transfer Venue by SUSAN BRAUCHER. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (LEHMANN, ALEXIS) Modified on 5/28/2019 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES IS GRANTED, AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S CREDIT ONE'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS EXTENDED TO 5/24/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/18/19. 4/19/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION extending response date to Credit One Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss Complaint by SUSAN BRAUCHER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEHMANN, ALEXIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A..Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAW, JARROD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 4/10/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/22/19. 3/25/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A...(SHAW, JARROD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 3/27/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 3/4/19. 3/4/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Attorney), filed by CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A...(SHAW, JARROD) Modified on 3/25/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 3/6/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 2/5/19. 2/5/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN BRAUCHER re: Cassandre Civil served Summons and Complaint upon CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. by CMRR. CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A. (NO DATE GIVEN ON RETURN RECEIPT). (LEHMANN, ALEXIS) Modified on 2/1/2019 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF KATHERINE CARLTON ROBINSON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/25/19. 1/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Carlton Robinson, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13254799.). (GREEN, CASEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUSAN BRAUCHER. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC waiver sent on 12/14/2018, answer due 2/12/2019. (LEHMANN, ALEXIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 6, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SUSAN BRAUCHER. (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Summons Issued as to CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel on 12/6/2018 (ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXIS I. LEHMANN on behalf of SUSAN BRAUCHER (LEHMANN, ALEXIS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CREDIT ONE BANK, N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13209508.), filed by SUSAN BRAUCHER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(MAILMAN, MARK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 5/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braucher v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Madison A. Perry
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN BRAUCHER
Represented By: Alexis I. Lehmann
Represented By: Mandy M. Shell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?