Mpia v. Healthmate International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Josue Mpia
Defendant: Xiang Chen, Healthmate International, LLC and Shawn Chen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02276
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 Memorandum & Order & Order to Show Cause. Defendant Healthmate International, LLC shall have until August 16, 2019 to retain substitute counsel and file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. If Healthmate International, LLC does not retain substitute counsel and file a responsive pleading by that date, Healthmate shall show cause in writing on or before August 16, 2019, why the court should not direct the clerk to enter default against Healthmate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/2/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #9 Memorandum & Order,,, Order to Show Cause,,, Terminate Motions,, by Defendants Xiang Chen, Healthmate International, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Kernell, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #9 Memorandum & Order, Order to Show Cause, addressed to Xiang Chen. (tvn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #9 Memorandum & Order, Order to Show Cause, addressed to Healthmate International, LLC. (tvn)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting in part #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Answer. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the answer filed by defendant Xiang Chen is stricken as to defendant Healthmate International, LLC. Healthmate shall have until August 2, 2019, to retain counsel and file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 07/11/2019. Mailed to defendant Healthmate International, LLC and pro se party Xiang Chen by regular and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7018 0680 00018174 1417 (Healthmate International, LLC) and 7018 0680 0001 8174 1646 (Xiang Chen). (tvn)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/09/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answer by Plaintiff Josue Mpia(Ballew, Sara)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answer by Plaintiff Josue Mpia (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Ballew, Sara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Xiang Chen, Healthmate International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Envelope)(tvn) STRICKEN in part per #9 Memorandum and Order.
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Josue Mpia upon Xiang Chen served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019 (Ballew, Sara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Josue Mpia upon Healthmate International, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019 (Ballew, Sara)
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Xiang Chen, Healthmate International, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Josue Mpia. (Ballew, Sara)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4828088.), filed by Josue Mpia.(Ballew, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mpia v. Healthmate International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiang Chen
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthmate International, LLC
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Chen
Represented By: James J. Kernell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Mpia
Represented By: Sara T. Ballew
Represented By: Mark A. Kistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?