Kelley v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Keiflan B. Kelley
Defendant: Atchison County Clerk, Jack Laurie, Atchison County Jail and Travis Wright
Case Number: 2:2019cv02278
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 12/23/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 2/25/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/25/2020. See order for further deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/25/19. Mailed to pro se party Keiflan B. Kelley by regular mail. (hw)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Atchison County Clerk, Atchison County Jail, Jack Laurie, Travis Wright.(Wolpink, Jeannette)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 06/28/2019 for Defendants Travis Wright, Atchison County Clerk, Atchison County Jail, Jack Laurie to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 06/12/2019.Mailed to pro se party Keiflan B. Kelley by regular mail (ca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Atchison County Clerk, Atchison County Jail, Jack Laurie, Travis Wright. (Wolpink, Jeannette)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Atchison County, case number 2019-cv-000030 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4828876.), filed by Travis Wright, Atchison County Clerk, Atchison County Jail, Jack Laurie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wolpink, Jeannette)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison County Clerk
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Laurie
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchison County Jail
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Wright
Represented By: Michael K. Seck
Represented By: Jeannette L. Wolpink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiflan B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?