Russell et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Russell and JODI RUSSELL
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02285
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00395. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL (MDL No. 2887) - That the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Kansas, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Julie A. Robinson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, for PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION on 6/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A) (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Amended Complaint, pending resolution of the motions for transfer and consolidation under 27 U.S.C. 1407 currently pending before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings and deadlines in this case are STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/28/2019. (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Class Action Complaint, (djb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, #1 Class Action Complaint, by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC. (CHANOINE, HANNAH) Modified on 3/27/2019 (djb). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NONE for COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY.. (CHANOINE, HANNAH) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC identifying Corporate Parent COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY for HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC.. (CHANOINE, HANNAH) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by HANNAH Y S CHANOINE on behalf of COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC (CHANOINE, HANNAH) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, filed by MICHAEL RUSSELL, JODI RUSSELL. (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL RUSSELL, JODI RUSSELL. HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:18cv395-MCR/HTC. [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE REQUEST TO CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS by MICHAEL RUSSELL re #1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HILL'S PET NUTRITION INC. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REQUEST TO CLERK TO ISSUE SUMMONS by JODI RUSSELL, MICHAEL RUSSELL re #1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4402672.), filed by MICHAEL RUSSELL, JODI RUSSELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SCHULTZ, MATTHEW) Modified on 2/12/2019 to correct event (MB). [Transferred from Florida Northern on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: HANNAH Y S CHANOINE
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: HANNAH Y S CHANOINE
Represented By: Hannah Y. Chanoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Russell
Represented By: WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODI RUSSELL
Represented By: WILLIAM FRANKLIN CASH, III
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID SCHULTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?