Salazar v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oscar Salazar
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. and Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02295
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - The following cases shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Ana Alberto v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan.,Case No. 19-cv-2135-JAR-TJJ; Oscar Salazar v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2295-JAR-TJJ; Kristina Johnson and Cliff Palifrone v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2118-JAR-TJJ; Schwegmann v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Hill's Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2149-JAR-TJJ; and David Johnson, Angelina Raines, and Kayla Vanwinsen v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-2121-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 06/18/2019. (ses) Modified on 6/25/2019 (ses).
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by June 20, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 6/13/2019. (bw)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Oscar Salazar. (DeMarea, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Oscar Salazar - trial to be held in Kansas City. (DeMarea, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Oscar Salazar. (DeMarea, Andrew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4835586.), filed by Oscar Salazar.(DeMarea, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar v. Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Salazar
Represented By: Andrew M. DeMarea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?