Macias et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Magana Zamora, San Juanita Schneider, Juan Carlos Vasquez, Leticia Macias and Ashley Negrete
Defendant: Terminal Consolidation Company, Miles Leasing, LLC, BNSF Railway Company, Jane/John Doe Construction Corporation, Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas and Amino Bros. Co, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02305
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original filing of #28 Answer to Amended Complaint contained error in title only. Corrected version has been added to that entry and to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (heo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by BNSF Railway Company.(Divita, Nicholas) (Per attorney request, original filing blocked from public view due to error in title of document only. Corrected version added on 8/1/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (heo))
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Terminal Consolidation Company . (Patterson, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas.(Alig, Susan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by Terminal Consolidation Company.(Patterson, John)
August 1, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Terminal Consolidation Company (Higgins, Angela)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Amino Bros. Company, LLC ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, by Amino Bros. Co, Inc..(Bullins, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNSF Railway Company identifying Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC as corporate parent (Divita, Nicholas)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER- In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint #20 , the #14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is deemed moot without prejudice to refiling if deemed necessary. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 7/18/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 18, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Amino Bros. Co, Inc., BNSF Railway Company, Jane/John Doe Construction Corporation, Miles Leasing, LLC, Terminal Consolidation Company, Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas, filed by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez.(Cross, Gerald)
July 12, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Leticia Macias, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Ashley Negrete, San Juanita Schneider, Juan Carlos Vasquez re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT THE UNIFIED GOVERNMENT OF WYANDOTTE COUNTY/KANSAS, CITY KANSAS MOTION TO DISMISS WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cross, Gerald)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 07/09/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 Amino Bros. Company, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Letitia Macias by Amino Bros. Co, Inc..(Bullins, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 07/22/2019 for Defendant Terminal Consolidation Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/08/2019. (ca)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit A)(Alig, Susan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas (Alig, Susan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 BNSF Railway Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. BNSF Railway Company answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/2/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) or to Otherwise Respond by Defendant BNSF Railway Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Divita, Nicholas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Susan Alig on behalf of Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas (Alig, Susan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 6/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Miles Leasing, LLC.(heo)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez upon BNSF Railway Company served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Cross, Gerald)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez upon Miles Leasing, LLC served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Cross, Gerald)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez upon Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019 (Cross, Gerald)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez upon Terminal Consolidation Company served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Cross, Gerald)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez upon Amino Bros. Co, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Cross, Gerald)
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amino Bros. Co, Inc., BNSF Railway Company, Miles Leasing, LLC, Terminal Consolidation Company, Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
June 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Leticia Macias, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Ashley Negrete, San Juanita Schneider, Juan Carlos Vasquez - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cross, Gerald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Leticia Macias, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Ashley Negrete, San Juanita Schneider, Juan Carlos Vasquez. (Cross, Gerald)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4836962.), filed by San Juanita Schneider, Elizabeth Magana Zamora, Leticia Macias, Ashley Negrete, Juan Carlos Vasquez.(Cross, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macias et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Magana Zamora
Represented By: Gerald Lee Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juanita Schneider
Represented By: Gerald Lee Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Vasquez
Represented By: Gerald Lee Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leticia Macias
Represented By: Gerald Lee Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Negrete
Represented By: Gerald Lee Cross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminal Consolidation Company
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: Shawn M. Rogers
Represented By: Angela M. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Nicholas L. Divita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Doe Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County and Kansas City, Kansas
Represented By: Susan Alig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amino Bros. Co, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?