Mueting et al v. Unified School District 443 et al
Plaintiff: Nick Mueting and Paula Mueting
Defendant: Southwest Kansas Area Coop, District 613, Unified School District 443, USD 443 Dodge City and Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613
Case Number: 2:2019cv02317
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/18/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/18/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/19. (aw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613, USD 443 Dodge City.(Rupe, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alan L. Rupe on behalf of Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613, USD 443 Dodge City (Rupe, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy K. Schrag on behalf of USD 443 Dodge City (Schrag, Jeremy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Francis Schneider on behalf of USD 443 Dodge City (Schneider, Francis)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Francis Schneider on behalf of Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613 (Schneider, Francis)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy K. Schrag on behalf of Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613 (Schrag, Jeremy)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nick Mueting, Paula Mueting. Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613 waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (hw)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 (PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED INCORRECTLY - SEE DE #5)WAIVER of the Service of Summons by Defendant by Plaintiffs Nick Mueting, Paula Mueting. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 7/18/2019 (hw).
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Nick Mueting, Paula Mueting - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Jones, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Nick Mueting, Paula Mueting. (Jones, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4838159.), filed by Nick Mueting, Paula Mueting. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jones, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueting et al v. Unified School District 443 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Mueting
Represented By: Michael S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Mueting
Represented By: Michael S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Kansas Area Coop, District 613
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified School District 443
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 443 Dodge City
Represented By: Francis Schneider
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Kansas Area Coop District 613
Represented By: Francis Schneider
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Represented By: Jeremy K. Schrag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?