Dance v. Saul

Plaintiff: Joe Dance and Joe R. Dance
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2019cv02318
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - It is ordered that Plaintiff's motion #5 is GRANTED tothe extent it specifies the trial location as Kansas City, and the court deems the trial location at Kansas City as if it were specified in the Complaint filed originally. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/26/2019. (ses)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff Joe R. Dance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Driskill, Roger)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joe R. Dance. (Driskill, Roger)
June 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (ca)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David F. Chermol for Joe R. Dance pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing and Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney David F. Chermol to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4838274.) by Plaintiff Joe Dance (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Driskill, Roger) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #3 ECF Form) (gw).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4838208.), filed by Joe Dance.(Driskill, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dance v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Dance
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe R. Dance
Represented By: Roger M. Driskill
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?