Sahli et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Plaintiff: JENAEL SAHLI and SUSAN KINDREGAN
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02319
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:19-cv-09239. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-1) transferring case to the USDC for the District of Kansas. (dm ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee $150 received as to Charles E. Schaffer, Esq., receipt number TRE103216. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Hannah Y. Chanoine, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/06/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles E. Schaffer, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 6/06/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer. Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Schaffer by SUSAN KINDREGAN, JENAEL SAHLI. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Charles E. Schaffer, #2 Certification of Michael M. Weinkowitz, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay in Light of JPML's Pending Decision. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/21/2019. (jem) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Stay in Light of JPML's Pending Decision. Motion set for 5/20/2019 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine. Motion set for 5/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay in Light of JPML's Pending Decision by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BURTON, ALLEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Hannah Y. Chanoine by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Allen Burton, Esq., #2 Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BURTON, ALLEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. identifying Colgate-Palmolive Company as Corporate Parent.. (BURTON, ALLEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLEN W. BURTON on behalf of HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. (BURTON, ALLEN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENAEL SAHLI, SUSAN KINDREGAN. HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. waiver sent on 4/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HILL'S PET NUTRITION, INC. with JURY DEMAND, filed by JENAEL SAHLI, SUSAN KINDREGAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Payment Receipt)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahli et al v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Represented By: ALLEN W. BURTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENAEL SAHLI
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN KINDREGAN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?