Jacoby-Hale v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Plaintiff: Susanne Jacoby-Hale
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company and Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02325
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04951. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 17, 2019 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of Kansas. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of Kansas. (Signed by MDL Panel on 06/14/2019) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Refunded: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee refunded for Receipt number ANYSDC-16970529, for the following reason(s): duplicate payment. (jom) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. Document filed by Susanne Jacoby-Hale.(Longman, Howard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Howard Theodore Longman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Howard Theodore Longman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; the pleading was not signed by filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Howard Theodore Longman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Susanne Jacoby-Hale; Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.; Colgate-Palmolive Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Longman, Howard) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16971117)Document filed by Susanne Jacoby-Hale.(Longman, Howard) Modified on 5/29/2019 (sj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacoby-Hale v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. *** REMINDER TO COUNSEL -- This case is a tag-a-long action to 19-md-2887, MDL 2887 In Re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation***
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Jacoby-Hale
Represented By: Howard Theodore Longman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?