Sharon Manier v. Hill s Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Manier
Defendant: Hill s Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02328
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-04248. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Julie A Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Sharon Manier. Related Case(s): 5:19-cv- 00913 and 5:19-cv-00935 (Godino, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Colgate-Palmolive Company, Hill s Pet Nutrition, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sharon Manier, (Godino, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sharon Manier. (Godino, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sharon Manier. (Godino, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23749855 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sharon Manier. (Attorney Marc L Godino added to party Sharon Manier(pty:pla))(Godino, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharon Manier v. Hill s Pet Nutrition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill s Pet Nutrition, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Manier
Represented By: Marc L. Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?