Hussain v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Khalid Hussain
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, Ken Cuccinelli, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2019cv02361
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #4 Stipulation of Dismissal. (ydm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Khalid Hussain, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Clark, Bryan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/24/2019 for Respondents United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/26/2019. (ca)
July 2, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued to Attorney for service) (ca)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Petitioner Khalid Hussain. (Hoppock, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4853912.), filed by Khalid Hussain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit - Redacted H)(Hoppock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussain v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Bryan C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Bryan C. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Khalid Hussain
Represented By: Matthew L. Hoppock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?