Diaz et al v. Luckeroth et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Diaz and Tisha Diaz
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company and Kayla Luckeroth
Case Number: 2:2019cv02373
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to Clerk, Douglas County District Court transmitting #17 Order. Mailed to Clerk on 9/6/19 by certified mail; Certified tracking number 7018 0680 0001 8174 0793. (hw)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/6/19. (hw)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It appears the parties agree this case should be remanded to the District Court of Douglas County, Kansas. The scheduling conference set September 17, 2019 is canceled. The parties are relieved of the planning report and disclosures deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kayla Luckeroth of Defendant's Opening Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Ernest Diaz (Martinek, Ron)
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Kayla Luckeroth of Defendant's Opening Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Tisha Diaz (Martinek, Ron)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Defendant Kayla Luckeroth re #12 MOTION to Remand (Martinek, Ron)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Ernest Diaz, Tisha Diaz (Smith, Daniel)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Severson, Brooks)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/5/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/5/2019. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/2/19. (ss)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ron D. Martinek on behalf of Kayla Luckeroth (Martinek, Ron)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kayla Luckeroth.(Martinek, Ron)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Government Employees Insurance Company. Amendment to #3 Designation of Place of Trial . (Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company with Local Rule 81.2. (Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Geico's Certificate of Filing Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Government Employees Insurance Company. (Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Government Employees Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Government Employee Insurance Company. (Severson, Brooks)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Douglas County District Court, case number 19-cv-188 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4858742.), filed by Government Employee Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Severson, Brooks) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ca) to accurately reflect trial location per filing of amended Designation of Place of Trial.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Luckeroth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla Luckeroth
Represented By: Ron D. Martinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Diaz
Represented By: Daniel Caleb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Diaz
Represented By: Daniel Caleb Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?