Batchler v. Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cheri Batchler
Defendant: Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02385
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 1:00 PM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The parties planning report and disclosures will remain due on September 9, 2019.(ss)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 9/9/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/13/19. (ss)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc.(Horn, Stephen)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Cheri Batchler upon Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc. served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019 (Galloway, Lewis)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Cheri Batchler. (Galloway, Lewis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4862473.), filed by Cheri Batchler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A - Redacted Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue)(Galloway, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Batchler v. Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hague Quality Water of Kansas City, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Paul Horn
Represented By: Daniel N. Allmayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Batchler
Represented By: Lewis M. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?