Davis v. Price Brothers Management
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Davis
Defendant: Price Brothers Management
Case Number: 2:2019cv02419
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Report and Recommendation regarding Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), Plaintiff may commence this action without prepayment of fees or security therefor. The Clerk shall issue Summons for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/13/2019. Mailed to pro se party Ronald L. Davis by regular mail. (ts)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Sealed Exhibit in Support of Motion for Reconsideration #6 by Plaintiff Ronald L. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(hw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy by Plaintiff Ronald L. Davis. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (hw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Ronald L. Davis. (hw)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (in forma pauperis) filed by Ronald L. Davis. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the court's privacy policy. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/23/2019. Mailed to pro se party Ronald L. Davis by certified mail. The Certified Tracking Number is 70162070000006868935. (ts)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Ronald L. Davis (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(tvn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronald L. Davis. (tvn)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Ronald L. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(tvn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Price Brothers Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Price Brothers Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?