Winters v. Central Bank of the Midwest et al
Plaintiff: Katherine M. Winters
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc. and Central Bank of the Midwest
Case Number: 2:2019cv02422
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
2 Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Mouber, Bryan)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/19/19. (alm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Bank of the Midwest identifying Central Bancompany, Inc. as corporate parent . (Croker, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant Central Bank of the Midwest's ANSWER to Complaint Petition by Central Bank of the Midwest.(Croker, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Trans Union, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mouber, Bryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union, LLC identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Mouber, Bryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Mouber, Bryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Bank of the Midwest identifying First National Bancor, Inc. as corporate parent (Prewitt, Kevin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Webb, Danne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc. identifying plc as corporate parent . (Webb, Danne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTION, INC.S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Equifax Inc. as corporate parent . (Zorogastua, Guillermo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Zorogastua, Guillermo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 08/13/2019 for Defendant Central Bank of the Midwest to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 07/29/2019. (ca)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew M. Hilderbrand for Experian Information Solutions Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (adc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Matthew M. Hilderbrand to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4872514.) by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit , #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration)(Webb, Danne)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Katherine M. Winters. (Stecklein, Alan)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/24/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Filing in State Court by Central Bank of the Midwest re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prewitt, Kevin)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Central Bank of the Midwest - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Prewitt, Kevin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Central Bank of the Midwest. (Prewitt, Kevin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2019-LM-002874 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4870369.), filed by Central Bank of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Prewitt, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Central Bank of the Midwest et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Guillermo Gabriel Zorogastua
Represented By: Phillip James Richard Zeeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Bryan E. Mouber
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Andrea S. McMurtry
Represented By: Matthew M. Hilderbrand
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Bank of the Midwest
Represented By: Kevin W. Prewitt
Represented By: Paul M. Croker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine M. Winters
Represented By: Alan J. Stecklein
Represented By: Matthew S. Robertson
Represented By: Michael H. Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?