Wheeler v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gary Wheeler
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02440
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.'s answer extended to 10/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/11/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendant Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Sheffield, Robert)
July 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Exhibit A of the Complaint is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Gary Wheeler. (Dugan, Mark)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4877754.), filed by Gary Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Right to Sue)(Dugan, Mark) Modified on 7/31/2019 (ca). Exhibit A blocked from public view due to violation of privacy policy. (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #3Redacted Exhibit A, Charge of Discrimination) (ca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wheeler
Represented By: Mark V. Dugan
Represented By: Heather J. Schlozman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Furniture Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?