Dorris v. It's Greek to Me, Inc.
Plaintiff: Naomi Dorris
Defendant: It's Greek to Me, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02445
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by It's Greek to Me, Inc. . (Seten, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by It's Greek to Me, Inc..(Seten, Kimberly)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for a Continuance of the Scheduling Conference. The court continues the scheduling conference to October 9, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/27/19. (ks)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 10 AM on October 1, 2019 by Plaintiff Naomi Dorris (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/10/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/26/19. (ks)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant It's Greek to Me, Inc. shall have until September 27, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant It's Greek to Me, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Seten, Kimberly)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal service by Naomi Dorris upon It's Greek to Me, Inc. served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019 (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 2, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to It's Greek to Me, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Naomi Dorris. (Ziegelmeyer, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4881117.), filed by Naomi Dorris.(Ziegelmeyer, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorris v. It's Greek to Me, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Dorris
Represented By: John J. Ziegelmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It's Greek to Me, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly F. Seten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?