Sturgill v. Russell Stover Candies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joshua R. Sturgill
Defendant: Russell Stover Candies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02459
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/22/2019 for Defendant Russell Stover Candies, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/03/2019. (ca)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Joshua R. Sturgill upon Russell Stover Candies, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019 (McKee, Aaron) (Modified on 10/7/2019 to correct defendant served. (heo))
August 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Russell Stover Candies, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Joshua R. Sturgill. (McKee, Aaron)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4888384.), filed by Joshua R. Sturgill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A - KHRC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(McKee, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturgill v. Russell Stover Candies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Stover Candies, Inc.
Represented By: AnnRene Sarah Coughlin
Represented By: Chris R. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua R. Sturgill
Represented By: Aaron C. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?