VanAnne v. American Bottling Company, The
Plaintiff: Thomas VanAnne
Defendant: American Bottling Company, The
Case Number: 2:2019cv02465
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Bottling Company, The (DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Bottling Company, The identifying Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Bottling Company, The.(DeVeney, Jeannie)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/16/2019. (mls)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until September 24, 2019 for Defendant American Bottling Company, The to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/09/2019. (gw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Thomas VanAnne upon American Bottling Company, The served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019 (Egan, Dennis)
August 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Bottling Company, The. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (heo)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Attachment 1 of #1 Complaint is not redacted properly. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Thomas VanAnne. (Egan, Dennis)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4891002.), filed by Thomas VanAnne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Egan, Dennis) (Modified to block attachment 1-1 from public view due to violation of privacy policy. Redacted version added on 8/14/2019: #3 Exhibit - Redacted) (heo))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanAnne v. American Bottling Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bottling Company, The
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Represented By: Jeannie DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas VanAnne
Represented By: Dennis E. Egan
Represented By: Tiffany B. Klosener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?