Lubberts v. Olathe Trading Post, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arnita Lubberts
Defendant: Olathe Trading Post, Inc. and Kevin Flaherty
Case Number: 2:2019cv02469
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Flaherty, Olathe Trading Post, Inc..(Marsh, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by October 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/06/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Kevin Flaherty, Olathe Trading Post, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Marsh, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Marsh on behalf of Kevin Flaherty, Olathe Trading Post, Inc.. (Marsh, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Karen J. Halbrook on behalf of Kevin Flaherty, Olathe Trading Post, Inc.. (Halbrook, Karen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Reg. Agt. Brian Anderson SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Arnita Lubberts upon Olathe Trading Post, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019 (Holman, Kirk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #1 Correct Summons Returned) (hw).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Arnita Lubberts upon Kevin Flaherty served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Holman, Kirk)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kevin Flaherty, Olathe Trading Post, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (hw)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Arnita Lubberts. (Holman, Kirk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4891322.), filed by Arnita Lubberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holman, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lubberts v. Olathe Trading Post, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Trading Post, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Marsh
Represented By: Karen J. Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Flaherty
Represented By: Michael J. Marsh
Represented By: Karen J. Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnita Lubberts
Represented By: Kirk D. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?