Akins v. Watco Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: Melissa Akins
Defendant: Watco Companies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02471
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Watco Companies, LLC.(Coverdale, Brent)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/30/2019 for Defendant Watco Companies, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/16/2019. (gw)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Craig M. Leff on behalf of Watco Companies, LLC (Leff, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brent N. Coverdale on behalf of Watco Companies, LLC (Coverdale, Brent)
August 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Watco Companies, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Melissa Akins. (Thornberry, Stephen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4891545.), filed by Melissa Akins.(Thornberry, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins v. Watco Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watco Companies, LLC
Represented By: Brent N. Coverdale
Represented By: Craig M. Leff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Akins
Represented By: Stephen C. Thornberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?