Madrigal v. Unified School District No. 512 et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Madrigal
Defendant: Unified School District No. 512, Shawnee Mission School District and Westwood View Elementary
Case Number: 2:2019cv02472
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Madrigal. Westwood View Elementary waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Liesen, Sarah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jennifer Madrigal. Unified School District No. 512 waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Liesen, Sarah)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jennifer Madrigal. (Edelman, Alexander)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892262.), filed by Jennifer Madrigal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A -- Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B -- Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit C -- Right to Sue Notice, #4 Exhibit D -- Right to Sue Notice)(Edelman, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrigal v. Unified School District No. 512 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified School District No. 512
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnee Mission School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood View Elementary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Madrigal
Represented By: Alexander L. Edelman
Represented By: Sarah Liesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?