Rodriguez v. InfuSystem, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez
Defendant: First Biomedical, Inc., InfuSystem, Inc. and InfuSystem Holdings
Case Number: 2:2019cv02473
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by InfuSystem, Inc..(Welch, Sara)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/04/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/04/2019 for Defendant InfuSystem, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/19/2019. (ca)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez upon InfuSystem, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Atwell, Ashley)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 (DISREGARD, see #4 ) -- SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez upon InfuSystem, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019 (Atwell, Ashley) Modified on 9/12/2019, see #4 for the corrected service/answer date for InfuSystem, Inc. (mam)
August 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to InfuSystem, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (Atwell, Ashley)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892267.), filed by Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue)(Atwell, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. InfuSystem, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Biomedical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InfuSystem, Inc.
Represented By: Sara E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InfuSystem Holdings
Represented By: Sara E. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Guadalupe Rodriguez
Represented By: Ashley Helen Atwell
Represented By: Heather Hardinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?