Westwind Plaza, Inc. v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Westwind Plaza, Inc.
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02477
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/7/2019. (alm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Fire & Casualty Company . (Schultz, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by United Fire & Casualty Company.(Schultz, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John G. Schultz on behalf of United Fire & Casualty Company (Schultz, John)
August 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Fire & Casualty Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey Todd Embry for Westwind Plaza, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Patrick Peirce for Westwind Plaza, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (tvn)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey Todd Embry to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892881.) by Plaintiff Westwind Plaza, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Shumate, Travis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Christopher Patrick Peirce to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892878.) by Plaintiff Westwind Plaza, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Shumate, Travis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Westwind Plaza, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Shumate, Travis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westwind Plaza, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Shumate, Travis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Westwind Plaza, Inc.. (Shumate, Travis)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4892861.), filed by Westwind Plaza, Inc..(Shumate, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westwind Plaza, Inc. v. United Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westwind Plaza, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Wesley Shumate
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Peirce
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?