Baker v. Blue Valley School District et al
Plaintiff: Terri E. Baker
Defendant: Laura Kelly, USD 229 Blue Valley School District, Derek Schmidt, Lee A. Norman and USD 229 Blue Valley
Case Number: 2:2019cv02480
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BV Policy 5110, #2 Exhibit BV Policy 1520, #3 Exhibit BV Policy 1521, #4 Exhibit BV Policy 1300, #5 Exhibit BV Policy 1100)(Baker, Linus)
October 5, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Child's Health Form, #2 Exhibit KCI Form)(Baker, Linus)
September 20, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dwyer, Angus)
September 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Dwyer, Angus)
September 20, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit BV Policy)(Chalmers, Arthur)
September 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt (Chalmers, Arthur)
September 17, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker re: #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy 2700, #2 Exhibit Blue Valley Letter on Vaccination Exemption, #3 Exhibit Kindergarten Brochure, #4 Exhibit Form used by Blue Valley)(Baker, Linus)
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District re #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Dwyer, Angus)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker re: #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Baker, Linus)
September 14, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker re #20 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction that is to deny or stay request for permanent injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.G. Opinion 2012-019)(Baker, Linus)
September 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #20 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction that is to deny or stay request for permanent injunction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(jc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Defendants Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt re #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction and preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chalmers Declaration, #2 Exhibit Goss, #3 Exhibit BV policy)(Chalmers, Arthur)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction that is to deny or stay request for permanent injunction by Defendants Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chalmers Declaration, #2 Exhibit Goss Declaration)(Chalmers, Arthur)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendant Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 229's #18 AGREED SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSETO PLAINTIFF'S #3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Defendant Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 229's RESPONSE deadline is extended to 9/16/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 9/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 11, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Dwyer, Angus)
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/20/2019 for Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/05/2019. (ca)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/20/2019 for Defendants Derek Schmidt, Lee A. Norman, Laura Kelly to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/05/2019. (ca)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendants Secretary Lee Norman's, Attorney General Derek Schmidt's, and Governor Laura Kelly's #14 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO #3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Defendants Secretary Lee Norman's, Attorney General Derek Schmidt's, and Governor Laura Kelly's RESPONSE deadline is extended to 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 27, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (jc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Defendants Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt (Chalmers, Arthur)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendant Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 229's #11 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S #3 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Defendant Blue Valley Unified School District, USD 229's RESPONSE deadline is extended to 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 8/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
August 27, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(jc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Arthur S. Chalmers on behalf of Laura Kelly, Lee A. Norman, Derek Schmidt (Chalmers, Arthur)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Defendant USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Angus W. Dwyer on behalf of USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Dwyer, Angus)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Arthur S. Chalmers on behalf of Lee A. Norman (Chalmers, Arthur)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by W. Joseph Hatley on behalf of USD 229 Blue Valley School District. (Hatley, W.)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Lovett-Bowman on behalf of USD 229 Blue Valley School District (Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Arthur S. Chalmers on behalf of Derek Schmidt (Chalmers, Arthur)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/21/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
August 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ydm)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #3 MOTION for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker (Baker, Linus)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker (Baker, Linus) Modified on 8/20/2019 to Preliminary to text per chambers (JAR). (ydm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Terri E. Baker. (Baker, Linus)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4893085.), filed by Terri E. Baker.(Baker, Linus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Blue Valley School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri E. Baker
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 229 Blue Valley School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Schmidt
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee A. Norman
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 229 Blue Valley
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?