Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. v. Parkes
Plaintiff: Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. and Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC
Defendant: Cathy Parkes, Cathy Parkes formerly known as Pass The ATI doing business as Level Up RN and Pass The ATI
Case Number: 2:2019cv02514
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Mark Williams-Abrams on December 15, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
November 23, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE of Subpoenas to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas)(Carlson, Robin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 176 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re: #160 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Carlson, Robin)
November 18, 2020 Filing 175 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Third Request for Production of Documents directed to Plaintiff by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Mark Williams-Abrams on December 14, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 173 DEPOSITION of Jerry Gorham taken on December 10, 2020 filed by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
November 17, 2020 Filing 172 NOTICE by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC of taking deposition of Cathy Parkes d/b/a Level Up RN on 12/17/2020 (Carlson, Robin)
November 16, 2020 Filing 171 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and Objections and Responses to Defendant's Second Set of Interrogatories by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
November 11, 2020 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Parkes' Supplemental and Amended Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 169 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
November 6, 2020 Filing 168 RESPONSE by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #160 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit Counsel's email, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Steven H. Schwartz, #4 Exhibit Letter to Andrew Ong, #5 Exhibit Unredacted email with Hartford)(Schwartz, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Kristi Burgess on November 17, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
October 23, 2020 Filing 166 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) E and F re #162 Affidavit in Support of Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F)(Carlson, Robin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 165 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #160 MOTION to Compel Insurance- Related Documents by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC(Carlson, Robin)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #163 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith the requested exhibits with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. A redacted version of memorandum must be filed (not under seal) while the full (unredacted) memorandum is to be filed with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/23/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
October 23, 2020 Filing 163 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Insurance Related Documents, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit E to Andrew S. Ong Declaration, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit F to Andrew S. Ong Declaration)(Carlson, Robin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew S. Ong re #160 MOTION to Compel Insurance- Related Documents by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L)(Carlson, Robin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 161 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #160 MOTION to Compel Insurance- Related Documents REDACTED by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC(Carlson, Robin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION to Compel Insurance- Related Documents by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #125 Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/15/2020. (heo)
October 14, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: Pre-Motion CONFERENCE held on 10/14/2020 by telephone. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
October 12, 2020 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Cathy Parkes' Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production of Documents directed to Plaintiff by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
October 7, 2020 Filing 157 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson: MOTION HEARING held on 10/7/2020 re #125 Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt filed by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. The Court takes motion under advisement.(Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (bw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE OF PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE: Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 01:30 PM (CDT) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. A brief joint description of the issue for discussion should be submitted by e-mail to KSD_Gale_Chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov no later than 10/12/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
October 5, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Deposition Subpoena to Insurance Office of America, Inc. by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Carlson, Robin)
October 5, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Deposition Subpoenas by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas)(Carlson, Robin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 11:00 AM and will be conducted by Video Conference - Zoom before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Non-case related participants can join the hearing by dialing into the CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and entering the ACCESS CODE 4697748#. The Court will provide the parties with information for the video conference by Zoom Invitation. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bw)
October 1, 2020 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories and Third Request for Production of Documents by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #150 Joint Motion to Extend Motion to Compel Deadline. Any such motion, if deemed necessary, shall be filed on or before November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
September 30, 2020 Filing 150 Joint MOTION for extension of time Second Joint Motion to Extend Motion-to-Compel Deadline by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 149 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re: #125 Motion to Enforce Judgment (Carlson, Robin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 148 STIPULATION Regarding Remote Deposition Protocol by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 147 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Becky Pontes on September 15, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting as unopposed #145 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt. The reply deadline is extended to 9/25/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/11/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
September 11, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Carlson, Robin)
September 10, 2020 Filing 144 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #137 Response to Motion by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Amended Subpoenas by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoenas)(Carlson, Robin)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
September 8, 2020 Filing 141 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Becky Pontes on September 15, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
September 8, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney noted error when trying to attach Exhibit C to #139 Sealed Motion to Leave to File Under Seal. The document was filed on the date of receipt at #140 SEALED Exhibit. (heo)
September 7, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #139 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
September 4, 2020 Filing 140 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #139 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Cathy Parkes. (heo)
September 4, 2020 Filing 139 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Steven)
September 4, 2020 Filing 138 DECLARATION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #125 Motion to Enforce Judgment Declaration of Cathy Parkes in Opposition to Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction (Schwartz, Steven) Modified to change title on 9/10/2020 (hw).
September 4, 2020 Filing 137 RESPONSE by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #125 Motion to Enforce Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z, #26 Exhibit AA, #27 Exhibit BB, #28 Exhibit CC, #29 Exhibit DD, #30 Exhibit EE, #31 Exhibit FF, #32 Exhibit GG, #33 Exhibit HH, #34 Exhibit II, #35 Exhibit JJ, #36 Exhibit KK, #37 Exhibit LL, #38 Exhibit MM, #39 Exhibit NN, #40 Exhibit OO)(Schwartz, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Cathy Parkes by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt. Defendant's response deadline is extended to 9/4/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml)
August 25, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt Without Objection. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
August 25, 2020 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt Without Objection by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Schwartz, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, Second Request for Admissions and Second Request for Production of Documents by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 132 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Tamerlin J. Godley, David Thoreson & Emily C. Curran-Huberty as to All Defendants (Seibold, Christopher)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #130 Joint Motion to Extend the deadline to file motions to compel by 30 days, to September 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/24/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
August 21, 2020 Filing 130 Joint MOTION for extension of time of Motion to Compel Deadline by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 129 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H to Declaration of Andrew Ong)(Carlson, Robin)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested document(s) with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams)
August 14, 2020 Filing 127 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt, #2 Exhibit H)(Carlson, Robin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Ong, #2 Exhibit A to Ong Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Ong Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Ong Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Ong Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Ong Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Ong Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Ong Declaration, #9 Exhibit - Redacted H to Ong Declaration)(Carlson, Robin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 125 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Motion to Enforce Preliminary Injunction Order and for Contempt by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Carlson, Robin)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #120 Motion for Protective Order/Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/14/2020. (df)
August 11, 2020 Filing 123 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re: #120 Motion for Protective Order, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Andrew Ong)(Carlson, Robin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER expediting the deadline to reply re MOTION for Protective Order /Motion to Quash Relating to Deposition of Becky Pontes #120 . Reply deadline 8/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/6/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
August 4, 2020 Filing 121 RESPONSE by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #120 Motion for Protective Order, Response to Motion for Protective Order (Schwartz, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Protective Order /Motion to Quash Relating to Deposition of Becky Pontes by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Ong)(Carlson, Robin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Amended Deposition Subpoenas to Chief Digital Advisors, Inc. and William Parkes by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Subpoenas)(Carlson, Robin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 118 OBJECTION(S) to #108 Notice to Take Deposition Dr. Jerry Gorham by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 117 OBJECTION(S) to #107 Notice to Take Deposition of Becky Pontes by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
August 3, 2020 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions, revised Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
July 29, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE held by telephone on 7/29/2020. (This entry is made for statistical purposes only.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
July 27, 2020 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents, Second Set of Requests for Admission, and Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Cathy Parkes by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
July 27, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE OF PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE: Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 02:00 PM (CDT) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. A brief joint description of the issue for discussion should be sent as an e-mail to KSD_Gale_Chambers@ksd.uscourts.gov on 7/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
July 23, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC Subpoena to be issued to: William Parkes (Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action) (Carlson, Robin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC Subpoena to be issued to: William Parkes (Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action) (Carlson, Robin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC Subpoena to be issued to: Chief Digital Advisors, Inc. (Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action) (Carlson, Robin)
July 23, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC Subpoena to be issued to: Chief Digital Advisors, Inc. (Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action) (Carlson, Robin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 108 NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Dr. Jerry Gorham on August 11, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE by Defendant Cathy Parkes of taking deposition of Becky Pontes on August 4, 2020 (Schwartz, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 106 ADR REPORT by Cathy Parkes. ADR session held on: June 19, 2020 and conducted by Richard McLeod. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Schwartz, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Monique M. McElwee as to Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (McElwee, Monique)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #102 Unopposed Motion to Extend the deadline to file a motion to compel, if any, relating to responses to First Set of Requests for Admission. Deadline for any such motion extended from June 1, 2020 to July 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
May 22, 2020 Filing 103 JOINT MEDIATION NOTICE - Mediation to be held 06/19/20 by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Carlson, Robin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Motion to Compel Deadline by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on April 29, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/28/20. (aw)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #87 Motion for Protective Order. The Court is, however, entering a protective order as proposed by Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/28/2020. (df)
April 28, 2020 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re #96 MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Answer to Complaint Conditional Non-Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carlson, Robin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 97 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re: #87 MOTION for Protective Order (Carlson, Robin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Answer to Complaint by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's First Amended Answer)(Schwartz, Steven)
April 10, 2020 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #87 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 16, 2020 email from Andrew Ong with draft protective order, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 17, 2020 email from Steve Schwartz with draft protective order)(Schwartz, Steven)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting, as unopposed, #93 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel. Any such motion, if deemed necessary, shall be filed on or before June 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/1/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
April 1, 2020 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time (Unopposed Motion to Extend Motion to Compel Deadline) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
March 30, 2020 Filing 92 REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (284 pgs) held 11/12/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, re #76 Transcript, Court Reporter: Kelli Stewart. Pursuant to Judicial Conference Policy, this Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber for 90 days from the filing of the original unredacted transcript. After that date (see original transcript filing), the transcript may be obtained through PACER. (ks)
March 24, 2020 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #78 Motion to Redact Transcript; granting in part and denying in part #80 Sealed Motion. The Clerk's office is directed to file the Transcript of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Doc. 76) under seal, immediately. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court reporter will publicly file a redacted version of the Transcript of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing in accordance with this order, no later than April 1, 2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 3/24/2020. (ydm)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order and Other Deadlines. For good cause shown, the following deadlines set in the Scheduling Order [Doc. 82] are revised: Plaintiff's good-faith settlement proposal due 5/29/2020; Defendant's settlement counter-proposal due 6/5/2020; Parties to file Joint Mediation notice by 5/25/2020; Mediation to be completed by 6/25/2020. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order [Doc. 87] is extended to 4/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/24/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
March 24, 2020 Filing 89 Joint MOTION for extension of time (JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND OTHER DEADLINES) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #87 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Ong)(Carlson, Robin)
March 17, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Submissions Relating to Protective Order. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to either submit a jointly proposed protective order or file a motion for entry of a protective order is extended to 3/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/10/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
March 10, 2020 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Submissions Relating to Protective Order by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Carlson, Robin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions by Cathy Parkes. (Schwartz, Steven)
March 5, 2020 Filing 83 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A corrected document of #82 Scheduling Order has been added to the entry and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (smc)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time five days. Discovery deadline 1/29/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 3/5/2021. Mediation deadline 4/30/2020. Joint Mediation Notice filed by 3/30/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/3/20. (aw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #1 Corrected Scheduling Order) (smc). Modified to attach corrected scheduling order on 3/5/2020. Incorrect discovery deadline on original order.(smc)
March 3, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re #78 MOTION to Redact Transcript filed by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. Memorandum in Opposition deadline 3/13/2020. Reply Memorandum deadline 3/18/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/28/2020. (smc)
February 28, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #78 MOTION to Redact Transcript re #76 Portions of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript, #80 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Redact Portions of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
February 28, 2020 Filing 80 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Redact Portions of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carlson, Robin)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #77 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel is directed to file the requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed documents to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed documents from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on February 28, 2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
February 27, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION to Redact Transcript re #76 Portions of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carlson, Robin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 77 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Motion to Redact Portions of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Transcript by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 2)(Carlson, Robin)
February 25, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY to Reset Hearings: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference is reset from 2:00 PM to 09:00 AM on 3/3/2020 by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. PLEASE NOTE THIS IS A CHANGE IN THE TIME ONLY. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
February 6, 2020 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (284 pgs) held 11/12/2019 before Judge Julie A. Robinson, Court Reporter Kelli Stewart, 913-735-2334, kelli_stewart@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Ms. Tamerlin Godley. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2020. (ks)
January 31, 2020 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration Concerning the Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos. The motion to reconsider is denied. The motion to clarify is granted as explained in this order. See Order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/31/2020. (heo)
January 28, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Michaela C. Ogden as to Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Carlson, Robin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 73 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re: #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos (Carlson, Robin)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 02:00 PM (CDT) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/25/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/25/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/16/20. (aw)
January 6, 2020 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos (Seibold, Christopher)
December 31, 2019 Filing 70 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Sarah Lynn Baltzell and Jordan Kane and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Christopher J. Seibold on behalf of Cathy Parkes (Seibold, Christopher)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #65 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's #61 Motion to Clarify or Reconsider the Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos. Defendant's request for a 21-day extension is denied. Instead, the Court grants a 10-day extension. Defendant's response deadline is now 1/6/2020. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on December 23, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
December 23, 2019 Filing 68 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version to #59 Memorandum & Order, has been attached to the entry and is being provided with this entry for notification purposes. (ydm)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #63 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Redacted Version of Memorandum and Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on December 23, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
December 20, 2019 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos (Carlson, Robin)
December 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
December 19, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Seibold, Christopher)
December 17, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Redacted Version of Memorandum and Order . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Redacted Version of Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum and Order (Redacted Version))(Carlson, Robin)
December 16, 2019 Filing 63 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to file Redacted Version of Memorandum and Order by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Carlson, Robin)
December 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
December 13, 2019 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC(Carlson, Robin)
December 13, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Clarify or Reconsideration Concerning Scope of Preliminary Injunctive Relief as to Defendant's YouTube Videos by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brett M. Schuman)(Carlson, Robin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE AND ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/9/2019. (bw)
December 9, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, ***Document Sealed. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 13) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike or alternatively Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is (Doc. 44) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's Motion to Strike is denied. Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Surreply is granted. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 12/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Redacted Memorandum and Order) (ydm).
November 22, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re: #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #44 MOTION for Leave to file Defendant Level UP RN's Motion to Strike New Material or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply MOTION to Strike (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
November 18, 2019 Filing 57 Joint Additional Exhibit List for the November 12, 2019 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction EXHIBIT LIST by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC.(Carlson, Robin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson: MOTION HEARING held on 11/12/2019 re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Court Reporter Kelli Stewart.) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Defendant's Exhibit List, #3 Witness List) (bw)
November 11, 2019 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC re #44 MOTION for Leave to file Defendant Level UP RN's Motion to Strike New Material or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply MOTION to Strike (Carlson, Robin)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven H. Schwartz as counsel for Cathy Parkes pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/8/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
November 8, 2019 Filing 53 SEALED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #44 MOTION for Leave to file Defendant Level UP RN's Motion to Strike New Material or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply MOTION to Strike by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit SEALED Exhibit B - Surreply Declaration of William Parkes)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
November 8, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for attorney Steven H. Schwartz to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4976233.) by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Registration Form)(Seibold, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Documents Under Seal. Counsel directed to file forthwith requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed documents to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed documents from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on November 8, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Emily C. Curran-Huberty as counsel for Cathy Parkes pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for attorney Emily C. Curran-Huberty to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4967783.) by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Registration Form)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Andrew S. Ong as counsel for Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/30/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for attorney Andrew S. Ong to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4965349.) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carlson, Robin)
October 29, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #44 MOTION for Leave to file Defendant Level UP RN's Motion to Strike New Material or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply MOTION to Strike, #46 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion to Strike or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply and Exhibits. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 46 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion to Strike or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply and Exhibits by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #44 MOTION to Strike New Material or Alternatively for Leave to File a Surreply by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Surreply Declaration of William Parkes)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah) Modified on 10/28/2019 (ses).
October 28, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION TO STRIKE Plaintiff's New Material in Support of plaintiff's #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or, alternatively, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE a Surreply by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah). Added MOTION to Strike on 10/28/2019 (ses).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND NOTICE of Hearing (DATE CHANGE): THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : This hearing was originally set for 11/7/2019. Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule (jury trial), the Motion Hearing is reset for 11/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(bw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 42 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #33 Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit 19 to Jerry Gorham Declaration, #3 Exhibit D to Jaime Fiorucci-Hughes Declaration)(Carlson, Robin)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel is directed to file forthwith requested documents with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed documents to counsel of record. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on October 18, 2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Redacted Declaration of Catherine Parkes and to File the Original Declaration Under Seal. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/18/2019. (heo)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition (Doc. #27 ) filed on October 11, 2019, is deemed timely. Plaintiff ATI shall have an additional day to file the reply brief now due on October 18, 2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/18/2019. (heo)
October 18, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #38 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
October 17, 2019 Filing 38 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit 19 to Gorham Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fiorucci-Hughes Declaration)(Carlson, Robin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Jaime Fiorucci-Hughes re #33 Reply to Response to Motion by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Carlson, Robin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca Pontes re #33 Reply to Response to Motion by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Carlson, Robin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Brett Schuman re #33 Reply to Response to Motion by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1)(Carlson, Robin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Gorham re #33 Reply to Response to Motion by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 3, #4 Ex. 4, #5 Ex. 5, #6 Ex. 6, #7 Ex. 7 part 1, #8 Ex. 7 part 2, #9 Ex. 7 part 3, #10 Ex. 8 part 1, #11 Ex. 8 part 2, #12 Ex. 9 part 1, #13 Ex. 9 part 2, #14 Ex. 10 part 1, #15 Ex. 10 part 2, #16 Ex. 10 part 3, #17 Ex. 11 part 1, #18 Ex. 11 part 2, #19 Ex. 11 part 3, #20 Ex. 12, #21 Ex. 13, #22 Ex. 14, #23 Ex. 15 part 1, #24 Ex. 15 part 2, #25 Ex. 16, #26 Ex. 17, #27 Ex. 18, #28 Ex. 19)(Carlson, Robin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. re: #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Redacted (Carlson, Robin)
October 15, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Declaration of Catherine Parkes and to File the Original Declaration Under Seal. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
October 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Notice of Non-Opposition Re: Level Up RN's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 30) by Cathy Parkes re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #28 Exhibits,,,,,,,, (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 14, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Declaration of Catherine Parkes and to File the Original Declaration Under Seal by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Declaration of Catherine Parkes)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 11, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #30 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #28 Exhibits,,,,,,,, . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
October 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #28 Exhibits,,,,,,,, by Defendant Cathy Parkes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Tamerlin Godley)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 29 Amended MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 28 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Cathy Parkes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Cathy Parkes, #2 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Cathy Parkes - Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Declaration of William Parkes, #10 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 1, #11 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 2, #12 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 3, #13 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 4, #14 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 5, #15 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 6, #16 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 7, #17 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 8, #18 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 9, #19 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit William Parkes - Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica Coviello, #27 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 1, #28 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 2, #29 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 3, #30 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 4, #31 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 5, #32 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 6, #33 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 7, #34 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 8, #35 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 9, #36 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 10, #37 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 11, #38 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 12, #39 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 13, #40 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 14, #41 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 15, #42 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 16, #43 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 17, #44 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 18, #45 Exhibit Jessica Coviello - Exhibit 19, #46 Exhibit Declaration of Paige Migliozzi, #47 Exhibit Paige Migliozzi - Exhibit 1)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah) (Modified on 10/11/2019 to block from public view per JAR chambers; attorney advised should have been filed under seal. (heo)) (Modified on 10/18/2019 - Exhibits 28-2 through 28-47 unsealed per #40 Order. (heo))
October 11, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Cathy Parkes re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cathy Parkes (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial by Cathy Parkes (Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Cathy Parkes.(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney David P. Thoreson as counsel for Cathy Parkes pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney David P. Thoreson to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4930105.) by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Response deadline 10/10/2019; Reply deadline 10/17/2019; Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/19/2019. (heo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-4, #4 Exhibit A-5, #5 Exhibit A-6, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit E-1)(Carlson, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jordan A. Kane on behalf of Cathy Parkes (Kane, Jordan)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal concerning the portions of paragraphs and exhibits referred to on page 7 of Plaintiff's Motion. Counsel is directed to file the unredacted document with an event from the SEALED DOCUMENTS category. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/18/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (js)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tamerlin J. Godley as counsel for Cathy Parkes pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/18/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for attorney Tamerlin J. Godley to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4923225.) by Defendant Cathy Parkes (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vide Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Lynn Baltzell, Sarah)
September 13, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #15 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C)(Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. A-1, #3 Ex. A-2, #4 Ex. A-3, #5 Ex. A-4, #6 Ex. A-5, #7 Ex. A-6, #8 Ex. A-7, #9 Ex. B, #10 Ex. B-1-B-20, #11 Ex. C, #12 Ex. C-1, #13 Ex. D, #14 Ex. E, #15 Ex. E-1)(Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brett M. Schuman, and granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas M. Costanza as counsel for Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Indra Neel Chatterjee, and granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michaela C. Ogden as counsel for Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 9/12/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Nicholas M. Costanza to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4918952.) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Brett M. Schuman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4918942.) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Michaela C. Ogden to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4918935.) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carlson, Robin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Indra Neel Chatterjee to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4918918.) by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Carlson, Robin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/01/2019 for Defendant Cathy Parkes to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/11/2019. (gw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. upon Cathy Parkes served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019 (Carlson, Robin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carlson, Robin)
August 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cathy Parkes. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. identifying Ascend Learning LLC as corporate parent . (Carlson, Robin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Carlson, Robin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4904460.), filed by Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carlson, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C. v. Parkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assessment Technologies Institute, L.L.C.
Represented By: Timothy J. Feathers
Represented By: Robin K. Carlson
Represented By: Monique M. McElwee
Represented By: Brett M. Schuman
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Michaela C. Ogden
Represented By: Nicholas M. Costanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assessment Technologies Institute, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Feathers
Represented By: Robin K. Carlson
Represented By: Monique M. McElwee
Represented By: Brett M. Schuman
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Michaela C. Ogden
Represented By: Nicholas M. Costanza
Represented By: Andrew S. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Parkes
Represented By: David P. Thoreson
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Jordan A. Kane
Represented By: Sarah E. Lynn Baltzell
Represented By: Emily C. Curran-Huberty
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Represented By: Christopher J. Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Parkes formerly known as Pass The ATI doing business as Level Up RN
Represented By: David P. Thoreson
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Emily C. Curran-Huberty
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Represented By: Jordan A. Kane
Represented By: Christopher J. Seibold
Represented By: Sarah E. Lynn Baltzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pass The ATI
Represented By: David P. Thoreson
Represented By: Tamerlin J. Godley
Represented By: Emily C. Curran-Huberty
Represented By: Steven H. Schwartz
Represented By: Jordan A. Kane
Represented By: Christopher J. Seibold
Represented By: Sarah E. Lynn Baltzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?