Wilson v. Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Defendant: Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02515
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/2/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/2/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/25/19. (aw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc. . (Waldman, Jill)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint for Damages by Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc..(Waldman, Jill)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc., filed by Brian Wilson.(Mehl, Brittany)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/10/2019 for Defendant Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/25/2019. (ca)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Brian Wilson upon Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc. served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019 (Mehl, Brittany)
August 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Brian Wilson. (Mehl, Brittany)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4904625.), filed by Brian Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mehl, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comfort Plus Shoe Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wilson
Represented By: Brittany Coughlin Mehl
Represented By: Ryan Paulus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?