Kelly v. Keebler Company et al
Plaintiff: Bruce W. Kelly
Defendant: Keebler Company and Kellogg Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02519
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Toufic R. Saati for Keebler Company,Toufic R. Saati for Kellogg Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/17/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/27/2019. (mn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Toufic R. Saati re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 by Defendants Keebler Company, Kellogg Company(Stocker, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Toufic R. Saati to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4930646.) by Defendants Keebler Company, Kellogg Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Stocker, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keebler Company, Kellogg Company identifying Kellogg Company as corporate parent . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stocker, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Keebler Company, Kellogg Company.(Stocker, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer J. Stocker on behalf of All Defendants (Stocker, Jennifer)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Bruce W. Kelly upon Kellogg Company served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (Mannion, Kathleen)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Bruce W. Kelly upon Keebler Company served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (Mannion, Kathleen)
August 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Keebler Company, Kellogg Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Bruce W. Kelly. (Mannion, Kathleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4905429.), filed by Bruce W. Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mannion, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Keebler Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce W. Kelly
Represented By: Kathleen Mannion
Represented By: Kirk D. Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keebler Company
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Represented By: Toufic R. Saati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Represented By: Jennifer J. Stocker
Represented By: Toufic R. Saati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?