Saunders v. USD 353 Wellington et al
Plaintiff: Reed Saunders and P.J. Saunders
Defendant: Gray Brenda, Tammy Moore, USD 353, the Wellington School District, Robin Creamer, Brenda Gray and USD 353 Wellington
Case Number: 2:2019cv02538
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:794
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendants Brenda Gray, Tammy Moore re #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Mock, Terelle)
November 1, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant USD 353 Wellington(Severson, Brooks)
November 1, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Defendant USD 353 Wellington re #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Severson, Brooks)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Robin Creamer. (Adams, Corey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Robin Creamer. (Referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Adams, Corey)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES WHO WILL PARTICIPATE MUST DIAL 888-363-4749 and enter Access Code 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/12/2019. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Report and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures deadline 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/21/2019. (ts)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Robin Creamer(Adams, Corey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Robin Creamer (Adams, Corey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Corey M. Adams on behalf of Robin Creamer. (Adams, Corey)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Brenda Gray.(Mock, Terelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Tammy Moore.(Mock, Terelle)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Audrey D. Koehler on behalf of USD 353 Wellington (Koehler, Audrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant USD 353 Wellington(Severson, Brooks)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant USD 353 Wellington (Severson, Brooks)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/21/2019 for Defendant Robin Creamer to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/4/2019. (gw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/18/2019 for Defendants Brenda Gray, Tammy Moore to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/04/2019. (gw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by P.J. Saunders, Reed Saunders upon USD 353 Wellington served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/22/2019 (Brown, Sarah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/22/2019 for Defendant USD 353 Wellington to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/01/2019. (ca)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brooks G. Severson on behalf of USD 353 Wellington. (Severson, Brooks)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by P.J. Saunders, Reed Saunders upon Robin Creamer served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 (Curry, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by P.J. Saunders, Reed Saunders upon Brenda Gray served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019 (Curry, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by P.J. Saunders, Reed Saunders upon Tammy Moore served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019 (Curry, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robin Creamer, Brenda Gray, Tammy Moore, USD 353 Wellington. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Reed Saunders, by and through his next friend and guardian, P.J. Saunders against Robin Creamer, Brenda Gray, Tammy Moore, USD 353 Wellington, filed by Reed Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curry, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs P.J. Saunders. (Curry, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4913284.), filed by P.J. Saunders.(Curry, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. USD 353 Wellington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Brenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Moore
Represented By: Terelle A. Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 353, the Wellington School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Creamer
Represented By: Corey M. Adams
Represented By: Edward L. Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Gray
Represented By: Terelle A. Mock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 353 Wellington
Represented By: Brooks G. Severson
Represented By: Audrey D. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Saunders
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.J. Saunders
Represented By: Daniel G. Curry
Represented By: Sarah A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?