Bratton v. Yarco Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale Bratton
Defendant: Yarco Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02553
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time 5 days. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 12/20/2019, Mediation deadline 12/31/2019, Discovery deadline 2/28/2020, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/18/2020, Dispositive motion deadline 4/3/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Court Trial set for 12/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in KC Courtroom 427 (JAR) before Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/30/19. (msb) Modified type of trial on 11/1/2019 (msb).
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 10/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Yarco Company, Inc.. (Martin, Lisa)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lisa Martin on behalf of Yarco Company, Inc.. (Martin, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/8/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 10/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/19/19. (msb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Yarco Company, Inc..(Vogel, David)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yarco Company, Inc. (Vogel, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Yarco Company, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Vogel, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Yarco Company, Inc.. (Vogel, David)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 19CV03602 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4918129.), filed by Yarco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Michelle Carlson, #3 Exhibit C State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Vogel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratton v. Yarco Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarco Company, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Bratton
Represented By: Christopher C. Barnds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?