Johnson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: James E. Johnson
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 2:2019cv02559
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/28/19. Mailed to pro se party James E. Johnson by regular mail. (hw)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that this case shall be and is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(ii) because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and the court is without jurisdiction to address the claims raised at this time. Dismissal is without prejudice to file a complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g) seeking judicial review of a decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration made after Plaintiff has exhausted his administrative remedies before the Commissioner. It is further ordered that #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by James E. Johnson are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/28/2019.Mailed to pro se party James E. Johnson 5128 Leavenworth Rd. Apt I Kansas City, KS 66104 by regular mail. (ses)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order to Show Cause, addressed to James E. Johnson. (hw)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - It is ordered that Plaintiff shall show cause to this court no later than October 16, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed because it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; or because it seeks monetary relief against a defendant who is immune from such relief. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/17/2019.Mailed to pro se party James E. Johnson 5128 Leavenworth Rd. Apt I Kansas City, KS 66104 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 7018 0680 0001 8173 5676(ses)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James E. Johnson (ca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff James E. Johnson (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James E. Johnson. (ca)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by James E. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?