Lorhan v. American Strategic Insurance Corp et al
Plaintiff: Daniel S Lorhan and Daniel S. Lorhan
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp and Lititz Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02584
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Daniel S. Lorhan. (Clayton, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan R. Clayton on behalf of Daniel S. Lorhan. (Clayton, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Lititz Mutual Insurance Company. (Long, Nicole)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Long, Nicole)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/22/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/18/19. (ss)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal by American Strategic Insurance Corp, Lititz Mutual Insurance Company. (Long, Nicole)
September 26, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants American Strategic Insurance Corp, Lititz Mutual Insurance Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hatley, Heather)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants American Strategic Insurance Corp, Lititz Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex A)(Hatley, Heather)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County District Court, case number 19CV4334 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4931281.), filed by Lititz Mutual Insurance Company, American Strategic Insurance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B)(Hatley, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorhan v. American Strategic Insurance Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Represented By: Heather R. Hatley
Represented By: John Lavelle Mullen
Represented By: Heather Hatley
Represented By: Nicole T. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lititz Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather R. Hatley
Represented By: John Lavelle Mullen
Represented By: Heather Hatley
Represented By: Nicole T. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S Lorhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S. Lorhan
Represented By: Jonathan R. Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?