Lister v. Royal Valley United School District 337 et al
Plaintiff: Scott Lister
Defendant: USD 337 Royal Valley, USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education and Aaric Davis
Case Number: 2:2019cv02651
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/17/19. (ala)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction over School Board by Defendants Aaric Davis, USD 337 Royal Valley, USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education (Cooper, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Aaric Davis, USD 337 Royal Valley.(Cooper, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 12/10/2019 for Defendants Aaric Davis, USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education, USD 337 Royal Valley to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/27/2019. (ca)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Scott Lister upon Aaric Davis served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Dove, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Scott Lister upon USD 337 Royal Valley served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019 (Dove, Christopher)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal by Scott Lister upon USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019 (Dove, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aaric Davis, USD 337 Royal Valley, USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
October 22, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Scott Lister. (Dove, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4956939.), filed by Scott Lister.(Dove, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lister v. Royal Valley United School District 337 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 337 Royal Valley
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 337 Royal Valley Board of Education
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaric Davis
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Lister
Represented By: Daniel R. Zmijewski
Represented By: Michael Vincent DiPasquale
Represented By: Christopher S. Dove
Represented By: Dustin J. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?