Jacobs v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Serenity Jacobs
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02654
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Per DE 12 Order staying case for a period of 90 days, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell is cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Based on the parties' Notice of Settlement (Doc. 11), the case and all deadlines are hereby stayed for a period of 90 days. If a settlement is finalized, the plaintiff shall dismiss the action by filing a Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(i) or a Stipulation of Dismissal signed by all parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(ii). Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jmr)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Serenity Jacobs (Callahan, Ryan)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC shall have until December 5, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Holzhueter, Kersten)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in KC Courtroom 643 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 11/27/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/31/2019. (ht)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 11/14/2019 for Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 10/31/2019. (ca)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Johnson County. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 24, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC identifying PRA Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, case number 19CV05241 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4958979.), filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Kersten L. Holzhueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serenity Jacobs
Represented By: Ryan M. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?