Bowers v. Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc and Carl Mayer
Case Number: 2:2019cv02691
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
November 20, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Summons service date for defendants Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc. and Carl Mayer were incorrectly entered. The correct service date was 11/13/2019 and the correct answer due date is 12/4/2019. (ca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Carl Mayer served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019 (Voytas, Richard) Modified on 11/20/2019 to correct date of service (ca).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Eric Bowers upon Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019 (Voytas, Richard) Modified on 11/20/2019 to correct date of service (ca).
November 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Carl Mayer, Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Bowers - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 AO FORM 121: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Eric Bowers. (Voytas, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4975953.), filed by Eric Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revolutionary Business Concepts, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?