McElwee v. Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Nardico McElwee
Defendant: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02709
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Upon notification by counsel that this case has been resolved, Counsel shall submit the appropriate dismissal documents to the Court no later than February 24, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/9/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ala)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by John Nardico McElwee (Herring, Chelsea)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by John Nardico McElwee upon Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc. served on 11/23/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Certified Mail Tracking)(Herring, Chelsea)
November 18, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff John Nardico McElwee - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Herring, Chelsea)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John Nardico McElwee. (Herring, Chelsea)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4983721.), filed by John Nardico McElwee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - J)(Herring, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElwee v. Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nardico McElwee
Represented By: Chelsea S. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?