Runnels v. Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lateef Runnels
Defendant: Stanley Steemer International Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02731
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 02:30 PM (CST) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel who plan to participate should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 for the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 2/28/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 2/28/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/22/20. (aw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Stanley Steemer International Inc..(Bernstein, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Steemer International Inc. identifying None as corporate parent (Bernstein, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James N. Boudreau for Stanley Steemer International Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam R. Roseman for Stanley Steemer International Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/2/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
January 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Adam R. Roseman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5019471.) by Defendant Stanley Steemer International Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bernstein, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney James N. Boudreau to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5019441.) by Defendant Stanley Steemer International Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bernstein, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Stanley Steemer International Inc. answer or other responsive pleading due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/30/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint by Defendant Stanley Steemer International Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Bernstein, Robert)
December 16, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lateef Runnels.(Hardinger, Heather)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re #1 Complaint. The Court has been advised that as part of the parties' agreement to transfer this case to the District of Kansas, Plaintiffs will be submitting an Amended Complaint. Defendant has not answered the #1 Complaint currently on file and will wait to file the Amended Complaint. The Court notes that the parties are in agreement that Plaintiff should be allowed to amend. Further, the transfer occurred within the 21 day time frame for amendments pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(1). As such, no motion requesting leave to amend will be required. The amended pleading shall be filed on or before December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/6/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:19-cv-00767. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Assented to Motion to Transfer Case, (Doc. 10), is GRANTED. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas. Signed on 11/22/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to reassign/transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas filed by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Stanley Steemer International, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Defendant Stanley Steemer International, Inc..(Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/5/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 11/21/2019. Signed on 10/21/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Defendants answer due date 11/22/19. (Cordell, Annette) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Assented To Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its answer or other response to the Complaint on or before November 22, 2019. Signed on 10/16/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file responsive pleading filed by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Stanley Steemer International, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Robert H. Bernstein on behalf of Stanley Steemer International, Inc. (Attorney Robert H. Bernstein added to party Stanley Steemer International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bernstein, Robert) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Lateef Runnels. Stanley Steemer International, Inc. served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Dirks, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Courtney Marie Stout on behalf of Lateef Runnels (Attorney Courtney Marie Stout added to party Lateef Runnels(pty:pla))(Stout, Courtney) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
September 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stanley Steemer International, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stanley Steemer International, Inc. filed by Eric L. Dirks on behalf of Lateef Runnels. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6500484. Service due by 12/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dirks, Eric) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runnels v. Stanley Steemer International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lateef Runnels
Represented By: Heather Hardinger
Represented By: Michael A. Hodgson
Represented By: Courtney Marie Stout
Represented By: Eric L. Dirks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Steemer International Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Bernstein
Represented By: James N. Boudreau
Represented By: Adam R. Roseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?