USD 346 Jayhawk v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Unified School District No. 346, Linn County, Kansas and USD 346 Jayhawk
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02749
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case electronically opened in Northern District of California (20-00092). (hw)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-18). Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California (MDL 2913). ***Terminating Case. (hw)
January 2, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern California (MDL 2913).(hw)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by USD 346 Jayhawk upon Juul Labs, Inc. served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020 (Cartmell, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juul Labs, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 12, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Unified School District No. 346, Linn County, Kansas - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Cartmell, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Unified School District No. 346, Linn County, Kansas. (Cartmell, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5004876.), filed by Unified School District No. 346, Linn County, Kansas.(Cartmell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USD 346 Jayhawk v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unified School District No. 346, Linn County, Kansas
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USD 346 Jayhawk
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Kirk J. Goza
Represented By: Jonathan P. Kieffer
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Represented By: Bradley D. Honnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?