Cobb v. Examination Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wendy Cobb
Defendant: Examination Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02766
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Examination Management Services, Inc.'s Original ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Examination Management Services, Inc..(Maher, Luke)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra A. Wendt; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John R. Herring for Examination Management Services, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 unopposed motion for extension of time until February 7, 2020, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/6/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney John R. Herring to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5021826.) by Defendant Examination Management Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Maher, Luke)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Alexandra Wendt to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5021796.) by Defendant Examination Management Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Maher, Luke)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading by Defendant Examination Management Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Maher, Luke)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Wendy Cobb upon Examination Management Services, Inc. served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 (Stiles, Megan)
December 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Examination Management Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Megan Lowe Stiles on behalf of Wendy Cobb. (Stiles, Megan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5010755.), filed by Wendy Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Middleton, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Examination Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Examination Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra A. Wendt
Represented By: Luke G. Maher
Represented By: John R. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Cobb
Represented By: Marc N. Middleton
Represented By: Megan Lowe Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?